Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure (Daniel) O’Gallagher, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1689²Born
19 Sep 172233.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Nov 173748.9SelectedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
10 Dec 173748.9ConfirmedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
29 Dec 173748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
1749¹60.0DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure (Daniel) O’Gallagher
Bishop Bonaventure (Daniel) O’Gallagher O.F.M. (born 1689, died 1749) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallynaglack, Co. Donegal
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Donegal, Abbey, Co. Sligo

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 352
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 23
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast