Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fiachra Ceallaigh, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Tres Tabernae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1933Born
2 Jul 196127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jun 199460.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
7 Jun 199460.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
17 Sep 199461.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
17 Sep 200976.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
29 Jul 201884.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Fiachra Ceallaigh
Bishop Fiachra Ceallaigh O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLios U Chathasaigh
Ordained BishopSaint-Andr, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceBlackrock (County Dublin), Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Family grave, Lissycasey

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,367
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 30 Jul 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast