Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Anthony Adam Nowakowski

Bishop of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1958 Born
19 Aug 198931.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
1 Jun 200749.0AppointedBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
24 Jul 200749.1Ordained BishopBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
15 Jan 202061.6AppointedBishop of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)
21 Mar 202061.8InstalledBishop of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Anthony Adam Nowakowski
Bishop Kenneth Anthony Adam Nowakowski (born ) Bishop of Holy Family of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorth Battleford, Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
Ordained PriestSt. George, Cathedral, Saskatoon, SK, Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
Ordained BishopProtection of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Church, Vancouver, ON, Eparchy of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Holy Family of London (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,483
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2020
  • i: CB, 22 Jan 2020
  • i: CB, 21 Mar 2020
  • loc: CL, 10 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast