Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil (Wasyl) Filevich (Felivich)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1918Born
17 Apr 194224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Canada (Ukrainian)
19 Jan 194830.0IncardinatedPriest of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian)
10 Mar 195133.1IncardinatedPriest of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
5 Dec 198365.8AppointedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
27 Feb 198466.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
6 Nov 199577.8RetiredBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
20 Apr 200688.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Basil (Wasyl) Filevich (Felivich)
Bishop Basil (Wasyl) Filevich (Felivich) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saskatoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStryj
Ordained BishopSt. Michel, Cathedral, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c1/opd: CB, 12 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast