Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Motiuk

Bishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada

Apostolic Administrator of New Westminster (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1962 Born
21 Aug 198826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
5 Apr 200240.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
5 Apr 200240.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
11 Jun 200240.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
25 Jan 200745.0AppointedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
24 Mar 200745.1InstalledBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
15 Jan 202058.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for David Motiuk (VIAF: 106582300)
Bishop David Motiuk (born ) Bishop of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVegreville
Ordained BishopSaint Basil, Church, Edmonton, Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Edmonton (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,198
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast