Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Muros (Moiras), O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1405¹Born
15 Jun 147267.4AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
31 Jan 147368.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
1 Jun 148782.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1492¹87.0DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Muros (Moiras) (VIAF: 121665551)
Bishop Diego de Muros (Moiras) O. de M. (born 1405, died 1492) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuros, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Ordained BishopSacristy, La Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCiudad Rodrigo, Diocese of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 258, and Page 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,523
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 309, Number 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1473, Number 1
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast