Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Miaskowski, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Zechia


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1644AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Zechia
28 May 1645Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Zechia

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Miaskowski
Bishop Zygmunt Miaskowski O.P. , Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Zechia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPoznań, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast