Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavien Joseph Melki

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Dara dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1931 Born
17 Oct 195423.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 199563.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
24 Jun 199563.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
30 Dec 199564.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
25 May 199664.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dara dei Siri
199765.2AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 Mar 201179.3ResignedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Flavien Joseph Melki
Bishop Flavien Joseph Melki (born ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHassaké
Ordained BishopBeyrouth

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast