Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael MacDonagh (McDonough), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1699¹Born
1715¹16.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1722¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Nov 172829.8SelectedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
2 Dec 172829.9ConfirmedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
12 Dec 172829.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
26 Nov 174647.9DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael MacDonagh (McDonough)
Bishop Michael MacDonagh (McDonough) O.P. (born 1699, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColeraine, Co. Derry
Ordained BishopSt. Pius V, Chapel, Vatican, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Buried Place (Original)Irish Dominican, Church, Corpo Santo

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 56
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 68
  • c34: AT, 28 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast