Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jonáš (Jozef) Maxim, M.S.U.

Archbishop-Elect of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1974 Born
13 Jun 199823.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak), Slovakia
11 Jul 199823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak), Slovakia
23 Sep 200429.8EnteredPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
5 Mar 200631.2ProfessedPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
22 May 200833.5Solemn VowsPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
26 Oct 202348.9AppointedArchbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak), Slovakia
27 Jan 202449.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Jonáš (Jozef) Maxim
Father Jonáš (Jozef) Maxim M.S.U. (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLevoča, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak)
Ordained DeaconPrešov, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak)
Ordained PriestSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Prešov, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak)
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Prešov, Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak)

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovak).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2023
  • c01/od/qmsu: CB, 26 Oct 2023
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 28 Oct 2023