Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Massimo

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
5 Mar 166737.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 167141.2AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
30 Mar 167141.2Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Sep 1685³55.6DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Massimo
Bishop Domenico Massimo (born 1630, died Sep 1685) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopMoniales, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 18.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,723

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast