Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Lino Lopes Fernandes Braga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Benguela, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1931Born
26 Jul 196432.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 197443.1AppointedBishop of Benguela, Angola
2 Feb 197543.3Ordained BishopBishop of Benguela, Angola
18 Feb 200876.3RetiredBishop of Benguela, Angola
26 May 202088.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Benguela, Angola

MicroData Summary for Oscar Lino Lopes Fernandes Braga
Bishop Oscar Lino Lopes Fernandes Braga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Benguela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalanje
Ordained BishopMalanje, Diocese of Malanje
Death PlaceGeral, Hospital, Benguela, Diocese of Benguela

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,599
  • d: CB, 26 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast