Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakob von Liebenstein

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1462Born
149734.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 150442.4SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
31 Mar 150542.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Jul 150542.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Sep 150846.1DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob von Liebenstein (VIAF: 28262024)
Archbishop Jakob von Liebenstein (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiebenstein
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 11.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,045

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast