Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de LÚvis de Mirepoix

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1306AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
29 Jul 1309AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
28 Mar 1324AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
1326¹DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de LÚvis de Mirepoix
Bishop Pierre de LÚvis de Mirepoix (died 1326) Bishop of Bayeux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 320, and Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast