Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Gerard Lennon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1923Born
20 Jun 194824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
20 Jun 198056.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland
20 Jun 198056.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
27 Jul 198056.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
17 Oct 198966.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Gerard Lennon
Bishop James Gerard Lennon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast