Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Larios Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Riohacha, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1951Born
14 Aug 197625.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 199443.0AppointedBishop of Magangué, Colombia
24 Jul 199443.1Ordained BishopBishop of Magangué, Colombia
8 Mar 200149.7AppointedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
5 Jun 200453.0ResignedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
22 Jul 202170.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Riohacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Armando Larios Jiménez
Bishop Armando Larios Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Riohacha

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinillos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barranquilla, Archdiocese of Barranquilla
Death PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,528
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Jul 2021

Quantcast