Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arvid Kurki

Deceased

Bishop of Åbo, Finland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1511AppointedBishop of Åbo, Finland
5 Oct 1511Ordained BishopBishop of Åbo, Finland
22 Jul 1522DiedBishop of Åbo, Finland

MicroData Summary for Arvid Kurki
Bishop Arvid Kurki (died ) Bishop of Åbo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVesilahti
Ordained BishopStreignas
Death PlaceÖregrund

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 91
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1511, Number 3
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 103, Number 8,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast