Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Isimbardi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹Born
24 Feb 167648.1AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
1 Mar 167648.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
2 Jun 168153.4DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Isimbardi
Bishop Agostino Isimbardi O.S.B. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia
Ordained BishopTour des Miroirs, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,737

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast