Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Iribarne Arámburu, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Deán Funes, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1921Born
26 Feb 193210.7EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Jan 193917.6Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
28 May 194221.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
19 Sep 194423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
25 Jan 198058.6AppointedPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
19 Apr 198058.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
2 Jul 198059.1DiedPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ramón Iribarne Arámburu
Bishop Ramón Iribarne Arámburu O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate of Deán Funes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJovita
Ordained BishopStade municipal, Deán Funes, Territorial Prelature of Deán Funes
Death PlaceDeán Funes, Territorial Prelature of Deán Funes
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Deán Funes, Territorial Prelature of Deán Funes

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 149, Number 4
  • c1/qodm/loc: CB, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,563
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast