Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Huỳnh Văn Của

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Ph Cường, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Mizigi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1915Born
20 Sep 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 197660.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
22 Feb 197660.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
22 Feb 197660.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mizigi
8 Jun 198266.6ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
9 Jan 199579.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Ph Cường, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jacques Huỳnh Văn Của
Bishop Jacques Huỳnh Văn Của (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Ph Cường

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLueong Hoa
Ordained BishopSacred Heart of Jesus, Church, Ph Cường, Diocese of Ph Cường

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast