Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément-Joseph Hannouche

Deceased

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt

Protosyncellus of Sudan and South Sudan (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1950Born
13 Jun 197626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
24 Jun 199545.2AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
19 Mar 199645.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
1997²46.7AppointedProtosyncellus of Sudan (Syrian)
9 Apr 202070.0DiedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément-Joseph Hannouche
Bishop Clément-Joseph Hannouche (born , died ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Caire, Eparchy of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Le Caire, Eparchy of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian)
Death PlaceLe Caire, Eparchy of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian)

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,697
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • d: CB, 9 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 14 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast