Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Francisco Hanlon, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catamarca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1887Born
20 Sep 191325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
13 Sep 193446.7AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
17 Feb 193547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
29 Nov 195971.9DiedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Francisco Hanlon
Bishop Carlos Francisco Hanlon C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Catamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaladillo

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast