Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Guano

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1900Born
23 Dec 192222.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 196261.6AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
31 May 196261.7Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
26 Sep 197070.1DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Guano
Bishop Emiliano Guano (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1962, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast