Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Philipp Henri von Greiffenclau zu Vollraths

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1690Born
6 Apr 171524.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
30 May 171524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
14 Apr 174958.3SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
21 Jul 174958.6ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
5 Oct 174958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
25 Nov 175463.9DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Philipp Henri von Greiffenclau zu Vollraths (VIAF: 172430346)
Bishop Karl Philipp Henri von Greiffenclau zu Vollraths (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVollraths
Ordained BishopWürzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,976

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022