Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Weinberger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1624Born
164924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
3 Aug 166743.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
3 Aug 166743.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
2 Oct 166743.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
13 Jun 170378.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan Weinberger
Bishop Stephan Weinberger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbensberg, Diocese of Regensburg
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 15
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast