Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Girolamo Gradenigo

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1597³Born
25 Apr 164547.7AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
25 Apr 164547.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
23 Sep 1646³49.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
6 Jul 165456.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
16 Feb 165658.5SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
19 Dec 165760.3DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Gradenigo
Patriarch Girolamo Gradenigo (born Aug 1597, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria degli Angeli, Church, Murano, Diocese of Torcello (Turris)
Buried Place (Original)San Clemente, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90, and Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 56
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 3 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jun 2021

Quantcast