Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Goñalons, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1642Born
30 Mar 170057.8AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
13 Jun 170058.0Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
12 Aug 170866.2DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Goñalons
Bishop Guillermo Goñalons O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlayor
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Barcalona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 19, Number 4
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,609
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast