Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guiseppe Pietro Gagnor, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1884Born
30 Jul 190823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Feb 194156.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caserta, Italy
1 Feb 194156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thennesus
19 Mar 194156.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thennesus
30 Oct 194561.0AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
4 Nov 196480.0DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Guiseppe Pietro Gagnor
Bishop Guiseppe Pietro Gagnor O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCondove

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast