Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Gaddi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1499Born
16 Oct 152122.7AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
3 May 152728.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 May 152728.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
31 Jan 152829.0AppointedAdministrator of Cosenza, Italy
12 Dec 153334.9AppointedAdministrator of Sarlat, France
21 Jun 153536.4ResignedAdministrator of Cosenza, Italy
154445.0ResignedBishop of Fermo, Italy
9 Jan 154546.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
3 Jul 154546.5ResignedAdministrator of Sarlat, France
28 Feb 155051.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
27 Jun 155051.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
20 Nov 155152.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata
16 Jan 155253.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Gaddi
Niccol˛ Cardinal Gaddi (born 1499, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 24.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183, and Page 293
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1521, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast