Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Maria Frungillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1809Born
21 Dec 183324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
31 Dec 187768.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
31 Dec 187768.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
6 Jan 187868.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
5 Feb 188676.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rosario Maria Frungillo (VIAF: 88929768)
Bishop Rosario Maria Frungillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopS. Restitut, Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1878, Number 5
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast