Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anthony Soter Cardinal Fernandez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alberto Magno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1932Born
10 Dec 196634.6Ordained PriestPriest of Penang, Malaysia
29 Sep 197745.4AppointedBishop of Penang, Malaysia
17 Feb 197845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Penang, Malaysia
2 Jul 198351.1AppointedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
24 May 200371.0ResignedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
19 Nov 201684.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201684.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alberto Magno
21 Nov 201684.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alberto Magno
28 Oct 202088.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Soter Fernandez
Anthony Soter Cardinal Fernandez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSungai Patani
Ordained BishopPenang, Diocese of Penang
Death PlaceCheras

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,131
  • d: CB, 28 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast