Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Benedetto Fenaja, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1736Born
10 Mar 175923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Nov 180064.7AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
22 Dec 180064.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
27 Dec 180064.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
23 Dec 180569.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
20 Dec 181276.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Fenaja
Patriarch Benedetto Fenaja C.M. (born , died ) Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 22
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 161, and Page 305
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast