Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus de la Torre

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Ephesus

Vicar Apostolic of ’s-Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
1633²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 164638.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
9 Nov 164638.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ephesus
19 May 164739.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ephesus
10 Oct 165143.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
1657²49.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of ’s-Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
16 Sep 166153.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacobus de la Torre
Bishop Jacobus de la Torre (born 1608, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDen Haag
Death PlaceHuijbergen

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1647, Number 4
  • op/s589: CB, 22 Feb 2021
  • d.loc: CB, 23 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast