Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund O’Reilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1598³Born
1621¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 165759.2AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
26 May 165860.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
8 Mar 166971.0DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund O’Reilly
Archbishop Edmund O’Reilly (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained PriestMechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceSaumur
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame, Church

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 9
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast