Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogdan Stefanov Dobranov

Deceased

Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1914Born
23 Mar 194025.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 195944.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
10 Oct 195944.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
8 Nov 195944.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi
27 Apr 196550.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
22 Jul 197560.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
14 Dec 197864.0AppointedBishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
4 Oct 198368.8DiedBishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Bogdan Stefanov Dobranov
Bishop Bogdan Stefanov Dobranov (born , died ) Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlovdiv, Vicariate Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral, Plovdiv, Vicariate Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 100
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast