Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanase Khoriaty, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1884Born
5 Jun 191026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
7 Feb 192036.0AppointedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
14 Mar 192036.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Jan 193147.0DiedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Athanase Khoriaty
Bishop Athanase Khoriaty B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Saïda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoun
Ordained BishopMelkite, Cathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast