Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Léon Thomine-Desmazures, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thibet, China

Titular Bishop of Sinopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1804Born
22 Sep 182723.5Ordained PriestPriest
184742.8ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Apr 185652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
17 Feb 185753.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
3 May 185753.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
28 Aug 186460.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
25 Jan 186964.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thibet, China

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Léon Thomine-Desmazures (VIAF: 396144782729783729730)
Bishop Jacques-Léon Thomine-Desmazures M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thibet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMouen, Diocese of Bayeux, France
Ordained BishopHo-pao-tchang
Death PlaceMouen, Diocese of Bayeux, France

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 25
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast