Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Ignacio Clemente Delgado Cebrián, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Milopotamos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1761Born
17 Jun 178725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Feb 179432.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
11 Feb 179432.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
20 Sep 179533.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
2 Feb 179937.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
12 Jul 183876.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
27 May 1900Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Ignacio Clemente Delgado Cebrián
Bishop St. Ignacio Clemente Delgado Cebrián O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafeliche, Spain
Ordained BishopTrung tinh

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 113, Number 592
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285, and Page 455
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,856

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast