Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dalton

Deceased

Bishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1823¹Born
1847¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 185633.1AppointedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
25 May 185633.3Ordained BishopBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
5 May 186946.3DiedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Dalton
Bishop John Dalton (born 1823, died ) Bishop of Harbour Grace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThurles, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint John's, Diocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
Death PlaceHarbour Grace, Diocese of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 465
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1856, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,611

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast