Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Coueter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1896Born
20 Jul 192528.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 196064.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
25 Nov 196064.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taua
5 Feb 196164.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taua
29 Nov 197175.2AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Jun 197881.8RetiredBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Jun 198588.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elias Coueter
Bishop Elias Coueter (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Syria
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Paraíso, Church, São Paulo, Eparchy of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast