Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Luke Concanen, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of New York, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1747Born
14 Sep 176517.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Dec 177022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Apr 180860.2AppointedBishop of New York, New York, USA
24 Apr 180860.3Ordained BishopBishop of New York, New York, USA
19 Jun 181062.4DiedBishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Luke Concanen
Bishop Richard Luke Concanen O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilbegnet, Ireland
Ordained PriestLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 11
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 279
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 22, and Page 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast