Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Coccia

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Bishop of AntinoŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1762³Born
15 Apr 178624.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 181856.4AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
27 Sep 181957.5AppointedTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
28 Nov 181957.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
4 Jun 182967.2DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Coccia
Bishop Giacomo Coccia (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Lucia di Melazzo, Territorial Prelature of Santa Lucia del Mela
Ordained BishopSanta Lucia di Melazzo, Territorial Prelature of Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1819, Number 69
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast