Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Clifford

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1400AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1401AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
9 Oct 1401Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 1407AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
20 Aug 1421DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Clifford (VIAF: 60716419)
Bishop Richard Clifford (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311, and Page 529
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 59
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast