Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Stafford

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1395AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
20 Jun 1395Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
3 Sep 1419DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Stafford
Bishop Edmund Stafford (died ) Bishop of Exeter

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 373
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,832

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast