Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Heiworth, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1419AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
28 Jul 1420Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
13 Mar 1447DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Heiworth
Bishop William Heiworth O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFulham

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 208
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast