Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Totington

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Sep 1406SelectedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 1407ConfirmedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
23 Oct 1407Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
Apr 1413³DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Totington
Bishop Alexander Totington (died Apr 1413) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Gloucester

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 465
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast