Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Chappes

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1320AppointedBishop of Arras, France
21 May 1326AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
1328²AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
1331²ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
24 Mar 1336DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Chappes
Pierre Cardinal de Chappes (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillemeux, near Nogent-le-Roi, Diocese of Troyes, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 8.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167, and Page 115
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast