Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Habib Chamieh, O.M.M.

Bishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1966 Born
7 Sep 199124.9Perpetual VowsMember of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
14 Aug 199225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
17 Apr 201346.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina
17 Apr 201346.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nomentum
25 May 201346.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nomentum
22 Nov 201953.1AppointedBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina
7 Feb 202154.3InstalledBishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Habib Chamieh
Bishop Juan Habib Chamieh O.M.M. (born ) Bishop of San Charbel en Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut, Lebanon
Ordained BishopOpen Air, eglise patriarcale, Bkerké

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of San Charbel en Buenos Aires (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,793
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2019
  • i: CB, 10 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Feb 2021

Quantcast