Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Calderón de la Barca Nieto

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1641Born
26 Mar 166725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
20 Jul 169351.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
4 Oct 169352.0Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
25 Feb 171270.4DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Calderón de la Barca Nieto
Bishop Francisco Calderón de la Barca Nieto (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrgaz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 235, Number 1,460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 35
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast