Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ignacio de Castorena y Ursúa y Goyeneche

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1668Born
6 Jul 172960.9AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
27 Aug 173062.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
11 Sep 173062.1InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
13 Jul 173364.9DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio de Castorena y Ursúa y Goyeneche
Bishop Juan Ignacio de Castorena y Ursúa y Goyeneche (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacatecas
Ordained BishopMaison profèsse de Jésuites, Mexico, Diocese of Mexicali, Baja California Norte

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,964

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast